ME LD1509 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Amend the Laws Governing the Maine Uniform Building and Energy Code To Ensure It Is Consistent with Current Standards and Applies to Small Municipalities

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend the Laws Governing the Maine Uniform Building and Energy Code To Ensure It Is Consistent with Current Standards and Applies to Small Municipalities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - House - Enactment RC #281 (Y: 97 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #311 (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-06-17HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-17HouseROLL CALL NO. 281 (Yeas 97 - Nays 44 - Absent 9 - Excused 1)
2019-06-17HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-06-17SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-592) in concurrence
2019-06-17SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-592) READ and ADOPTED
2019-06-17SenateREAD ONCE
2019-06-17SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 311 Yeas 20 - Nays 13 - Excused 2 - Absent 0
2019-06-17SenateOn motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-592) Report ACCEPTED
2019-06-17SenateReports READ
2019-06-14HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-14HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-592).
2019-06-14HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2019-06-14HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-592) was READ and ADOPTED.
2019-06-14HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2019-06-14HouseOn motion of Representative WARREN of Hallowell, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2019-06-14HouseReports READ.
2019-04-18SenateOn motion by Senator Deschambault of York, REFERRED to the Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, in concurrence.
2019-04-16HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-04-16HouseSubsequently, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY.
2019-04-16HouseSpeaker laid before the House
2019-04-11HouseUnfinished Business
2019-04-04HouseUnfinished Business
2019-04-04HouseLater today assigned.
2019-04-04HouseOn motion of Representative SYLVESTER of Portland, TABLED pending REFERENCE.
2019-04-04HouseCommittee on LABOR AND HOUSING suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback