ME LD1504 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on August 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on August 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Modernize Rates for Small-scale Distributed Generation
Title
An Act To Modernize Rates for Small-scale Distributed Generation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-08-02 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #459 (Y: 88 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2017-08-02 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #428 (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Recede And Concur RC #387 (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - Passage To Be Engrossed RC #412 (Y: 105 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - Adopt Hbh-554 To Cas-276 RC #411 (Y: 105 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #371 (Y: 90 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-08-02 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #428 (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Recede And Concur RC #387 (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - Passage To Be Engrossed RC #412 (Y: 105 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - Adopt Hbh-554 To Cas-276 RC #411 (Y: 105 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #371 (Y: 90 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-02 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-08-02 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2017-08-02 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 459V 88 having voted in the affirmative and 48 in the negative, with 14 being absent, and 1 excused, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained. |
2017-08-02 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2017-08-02 | House | Subsequently, the Chair RULED the Bill was properly before the body. |
2017-08-02 | House | Representative MALABY OF HANCOCK asked if the Bill was properly before the body. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-08-02 | Senate | Subsequently LD 1504 In Senate, August 2, 2017, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 28 IN FAVOR and 6 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2017-07-20 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-07-20 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending CONSIDERATION |
2017-06-28 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-06-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-28 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 387 Yeas 29 - Nays 6 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2017-06-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator WOODSOME of York The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED To ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-276) AND PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-276) as Amended by House Amendment "B" (H-554) in concurrence |
2017-06-28 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-28 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2017-06-28 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 412 (Yeas 105 - Nays 41 - Absent 4 - Excused 1) |
2017-06-28 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-276) as Amended by House Amendment "B" (H-554) thereto. |
2017-06-28 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-276) as Amended by House Amendment "B" (H-554) thereto was ADOPTED. |
2017-06-28 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-06-28 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 411 (Yeas 105 - Nays 40 - Absent 5 - Excused 1) |
2017-06-28 | House | Subsequently, House Amendment "B" (H-554) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-276) was ADOPTED. |
2017-06-28 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2017-06-27 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-27 | House | Later today assigned. (Roll Call Ordered) |
2017-06-27 | House | Subsequently, TABLED pending ADOPTION of House Amendment "B" (H-554) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-276). |
2017-06-27 | House | Subsequently, the same Representative WITHDREW her REQUEST for a roll call. |
2017-06-27 | House | Representative HERBIG of Belfast REQUESTED a Roll Call. |
2017-06-27 | House | Representative O'CONNOR of Berwick MOVED to TABLE pending ADOPTION of House Amendment "B" (H-554) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-276). |
2017-06-27 | House | Representative HARVELL of Farmington REQUESTED a Roll Call. More than one-fifth of the members present expressed a desire for a roll call, which was ORDERED. |
2017-06-27 | House | On further motion of same Representative House Amendment "B" (H-554) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-276) was READ. |
2017-06-27 | House | On motion of Representative HARVELL of Farmington, Senate Amendment "A" (S-293) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-276) was INDEFINITELY POSTPONED. |
2017-06-27 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2017-06-23 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-22 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-21 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-21 | House | Later today assigned. |
2017-06-21 | House | On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, TABLED pending ADOPTION of Senate Amendment "A" (S-293) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-276). |
2017-06-21 | House | Senate Amendment "A" (S-293) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-276) was READ. |
2017-06-21 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-276) was READ. |
2017-06-21 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2017-06-21 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 371 (Yeas 90 - Nays 54 - Absent 7 - Excused 0) |
2017-06-21 | House | Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-06-21 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2017-06-21 | House | Later today assigned. |
2017-06-21 | House | On further motion of same Representative TABLED pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2017-06-21 | House | Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2017-06-21 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-276) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-293) thereto |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-276) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-293) thereto ADOPTED |
2017-06-20 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-293) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-276) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-276) READ |
2017-06-20 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-06-20 | Senate | On motion by Senator WOODSOME of York The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator WOODSOME of York Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Reports READ |
2017-04-25 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-25 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |