ME LD1504 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Ensure a Strong Start for Maine's Infants and Toddlers by Extending the Reach of High-quality Home Visitation
Title
Resolve, To Ensure a Strong Start for Maine's Infants and Toddlers by Extending the Reach of High-quality Home Visitation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules FINALLY PASSED in concurrence | |
2011-06-01 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-06-01 | (H) FINALLY PASSED. | |
2011-05-31 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-348) in concurrence | |
2011-05-31 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Rosen, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2011-05-26 | (S) ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. | |
2011-05-26 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence READ ONCE Committee Amendment "A" (H-348) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2011-05-25 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-05-25 | (H) The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-348) | |
2011-05-25 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2011-05-25 | (H) Under suspension of the rules | |
2011-05-25 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2011-04-22 | (H) The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. | |
2011-04-22 | (H) Received by the Clerk of the House on April 20, 2011. |