ME LD1504 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Summary
An Act To Provide Predictable Benefits to Maine Communities That Host Wind Energy Developments
Title
An Act To Provide Predictable Benefits to Maine Communities That Host Wind Energy Developments
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Mills [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2010-04-06 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-04-06 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2010-04-06 | (S) AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-829) thereto | |
2010-04-06 | (S) On motion by Senator HOBBINS of York The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED To PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-501) | |
2010-04-06 | (H) ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-04-06 | (H) In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. | |
2010-04-06 | (H) Subsequently, the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-501) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-829) thereto. | |
2010-04-06 | (H) Committee Amendment "A" (S-501) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-829) thereto ADOPTED. | |
2010-04-06 | (H) On motion of Representative FITTS of Pittsfield, House Amendment "A" (H-829) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-501) was READ and ADOPTED. | |
2010-04-06 | (H) On motion of Representative FITTS of Pittsfield, the House RECEDED. | |
2010-04-06 | (H) Speaker laid before the House | |
2010-04-06 | (H) Later today assigned. | |
2010-04-06 | (H) On motion of Representative PIOTTI of Unity, TABLED pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION. | |
2010-04-05 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2010-04-05 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-501) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "C" (S-516) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE | |
2010-04-05 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (S-501) as Amended by Senate Amendment "C" (S-516) thereto ADOPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE | |
2010-04-05 | (S) On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "C" (S-516) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-501) READ and ADOPTED (Remarks Made) | |
2010-04-05 | (S) On further motion by Same Senator Under further suspension of the Rules RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (S-501) | |
2010-04-05 | (S) On motion by Senator MILLS of Somerset Under suspension of the Rules RECONSIDERED PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-501) | |
2010-04-05 | (S) Taken from the table by the President | |
2010-04-02 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2010-04-02 | (S) On motion by Senator RAYE of Washington Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ENACTMENT in concurrence | |
2010-04-02 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-04-02 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 351 (Yeas 143 - Nays 0 - Absent 8 - Excused 0) | |
2010-04-02 | (H) Subsequently, PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2010-04-02 | (H) Speaker laid before the House | |
2010-04-02 | (H) Later today assigned. (Roll Call Ordered) | |
2010-04-02 | (H) On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, TABLED pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED. | |
2010-03-31 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-03-31 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-501) | |
2010-03-31 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2010-03-31 | (H) Under suspension of the rules | |
2010-03-31 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2010-03-31 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2010-03-31 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-501) | |
2010-03-31 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (S-501) READ and ADOPTED | |
2010-03-31 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2010-03-31 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED | |
2009-12-09 | (S) Received by the Secretary of the Senate on December 8, 2009 and REFERRED to the Committee on UTILITIES AND ENERGY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |