ME LD15 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Concerning the Property Tax Levy Limit
Title
An Act Concerning the Property Tax Levy Limit
Sponsors
Rep. Jeffery Hanley [R] | Sen. Paul Davis [R] | Rep. Richard Bradstreet [R] | Rep. Chris Johansen [R] |
Rep. Lester Ordway [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Pierce [R] | Rep. Raymond Wallace [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - Senate - Accept Min Ontp Rpt RC #51 (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis The Senate ADHERED to ACCEPT The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-03-30 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-30 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought to Pass Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 51 Yeas 18 - Nays 15 - Excused 1 - Absent 1 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report READ and ACCEPTED. In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Reports Read |
2017-03-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-23 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2017-03-23 | House | READ the Second Time. |
2017-03-23 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary. Report Accepted. |
2017-03-21 | House | TOMORROW ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING. |
2017-03-21 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2017-03-21 | House | On motion of Representative MARTIN of Sinclair, the Majority Ought to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-03-21 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT in concurrence |
2017-01-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-01-05 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2017-01-05 | House | Committee on State and Local Government suggested and ordered printed. |