ME LD1492 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Enrolled on March 20 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Attract, Educate and Retain New Mainers To Strengthen the Workforce

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Attract, Educate and Retain New Mainers To Strengthen the Workforce

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-20 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #519 (Y: 87 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #534 (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-02SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748.
2018-03-27SenateOn motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2018-03-22HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-03-22HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2018-03-20HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-03-20HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (S-368).
2018-03-20HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2018-03-20HouseCommittee Amendment "B" (S-368) was READ and ADOPTED.
2018-03-20HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2018-03-20HouseROLL CALL NO. 519 (Yeas 87 - Nays 58 - Absent 6 - Excused 0)
2018-03-20HouseOn motion of Representative KORNFIELD of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2018-03-20HouseReports READ.
2018-03-15SenateSent down for concurrence
2018-03-15SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "B" (S-368)
2018-03-15SenateCommittee Amendment "B" (S-368) READ and ADOPTED
2018-03-15SenateREAD ONCE
2018-03-15SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 534 Yeas 26 - Nays 7 - Excused 2 - Absent 0
2018-03-15SenateOn motion by Senator LANGLEY of Hancock The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (S-368) Report ACCEPTED
2018-03-15SenateTaken from the table by the President
2018-03-06SenateUnfinished Business
2018-03-01SenateUnfinished Business
2018-03-01SenateOn motion by Senator LANGLEY of Hancock Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT
2018-03-01SenateReports READ
2017-08-02HouseCarried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138.
2017-08-02SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138.
2017-06-20HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-20HouseOn motion of Representative KORNFIELD of Bangor the Bill and accompanying papers were COMMITTED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
2017-06-20HouseReports READ.
2017-06-19SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2017-06-19SenateOn motion by Same Senator Bill and accompanying papers COMMITTED to the Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs
2017-06-19SenateSenator LANGLEY of Hancock asked and received leave of the Senate to Withdraw his motion to accept the Majority Ought To Pass As Amended Report.
2017-06-19SenateTaken from the table by the President
2017-06-16SenateUnfinished Business
2017-06-15SenateUnfinished Business
2017-06-14SenateUnfinished Business
2017-06-13SenateUnfinished Business
2017-06-12SenateUnfinished Business
2017-06-09SenateUnfinished Business
2017-06-08SenateUnfinished Business
2017-06-07SenateUnfinished Business
2017-06-06SenateUnfinished Business
2017-06-06SenateOn further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report,
2017-06-06SenateSenator LANGLEY of Hancock moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
2017-06-06SenateReports READ
2017-04-25HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-04-25HouseSubsequently, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
2017-04-25HouseSpeaker laid before the House
2017-04-20HouseUnfinished Business
2017-04-20HouseLater today assigned.
2017-04-20HouseOn motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, TABLED pending REFERENCE in concurrence.
2017-04-19SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2017-04-19SenateOn motion by Senator LANGLEY of Hancock The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS
2017-04-19SenateSenator DAVIS of Piscataquis asked and received leave of the Senate to Withdraw his motion.
2017-04-19SenateSenator DAVIS of Piscataquis moved that The Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2017-04-19SenateCommittee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT suggested and ordered printed

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback