ME LD1489 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Address Maine's Immediate Workforce Needs
Title
An Act To Address Maine's Immediate Workforce Needs
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Langley [R] | Rep. Gay Grant [D] | Sen. Andre Cushing [R] | Sen. Seth Goodall [D] |
Sen. Roger Katz [R] | Sen. John Patrick [D] | Sen. Linda Valentino [D] | Rep. Paul Bennett [R] |
Sen. Joyce Maker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-27 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-27 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-27 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-27 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-27 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-194) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-364) thereto |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-194) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-364) thereto , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Committee Amendment "A" (S-194) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-364) thereto READ and ADOPTED , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-364) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-194) READ and ADOPTED |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules RECONSIDER ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (S-194) |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules RECONSIDER PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-194) |
2013-06-27 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by Senator HILL of York. |
2013-06-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator HILL of York, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence. |
2013-06-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-10 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-05 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-05 | House | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-194). |
2013-06-05 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2013-06-05 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2013-06-05 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-194) |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-194) READ and ADOPTED. |
2013-06-05 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2013-05-01 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-05-01 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Joint Select Committee on MAINE'S WORKFORCE AND ECONOMIC FUTURE. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | On motion by Senator Jackson of Aroostook REFERRED to the Committee on MAINE'S WORKFORCE AND ECONOMIC FUTURE |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Committee on MAINE'S WORKFORCE AND ECONOMIC FUTURE suggested and ordered printed |