ME LD1488 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on April 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-29 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on April 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-29 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Support Substance Abuse Assistance Projects Provided by Municipalities and Counties
Title
An Act To Support Substance Abuse Assistance Projects Provided by Municipalities and Counties
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Dion [D] | Sen. Stanley Gerzofsky [D] | Rep. David Woodsome [R] | Rep. Michael Devin [D] |
Rep. Mark Eves [D] | Rep. Andrew Gattine [D] | Rep. Michel Lajoie [D] | Sen. Teresa Pierce [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-29 - House - Acc Ought To Pass As Amend Rep RC #528 (Y: 91 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-29 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD). |
2016-04-01 | Senate | On motion by Senator KATZ of Kennebec PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT in concurrence |
2016-03-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-31 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-611), in concurrence. |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-611) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2016-03-30 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2016-03-29 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-29 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-611). |
2016-03-29 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2016-03-29 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-611) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2016-03-29 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2016-03-29 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 528 (Yeas 91 - Nays 58 - Absent 2 - Excused 0) |
2016-03-29 | House | The Committee Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2016-03-29 | House | On OBJECTION of Representative FREDETTE of Newport REMOVED. |
2016-03-29 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2016-01-26 | Senate | REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY in concurrence |
2016-01-26 | Senate | On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock The Majority Report Accepted in concurrence |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Reports READ |
2016-01-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-01-21 | House | Subsequently, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2016-01-21 | House | On motion of Representative FOWLE of Vassalboro the Majority REFER to the Committee on JUDICIARY Report was ACCEPTED. |
2016-01-21 | House | Reports READ. |
2015-12-23 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2015-12-23 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on December 21, 2015. |