ME LD1484 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding the Election Laws
Title
An Act Regarding the Election Laws
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2016-03-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-28 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2016-03-28 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2016-03-24 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-24 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-350) and Senate Amendment "A" (S-359). |
2016-03-24 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2016-03-24 | House | Senate Amendment "A" (S-359) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2016-03-24 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-350) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2016-03-24 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2016-03-24 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Subsequently, PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-350) AND Senate Amendment "A" (S-359) |
2016-03-23 | Senate | On motion by Senator CYRWAY of Kennebec Senate Amendment "A" (S-359) READ and ADOPTED |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-02-25 | Senate | On motion by Senator CYRWAY of Kennebec Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-350) in concurrence |
2016-02-25 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-350) READ and ADOPTED |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Subsequently, the Ought to Pass As Amended Report Accepted |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-02-04 | Senate | On motion by Senator CYRWAY of Kennebec Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of the OUGHT TO PASS AS AMENDED Report |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Report READ |
2015-12-18 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on December 18, 2015 and REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |