ME LD1482 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 2 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-02 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 2 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-02 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Summary
An Act to Amend Mercury Standards for Air Emission Sources
Title
An Act to Amend Mercury Standards for Air Emission Sources
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-02 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2009-06-02 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-06-02 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2009-05-29 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME And PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED in concurrence | |
2009-05-29 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2009-05-28 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2009-05-28 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2009-05-28 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence | |
2009-05-27 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-05-27 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED | |
2009-05-27 | (H) READ the Second Time. | |
2009-05-27 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2009-05-26 | (H) TOMORROW ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING. | |
2009-05-26 | (H) The Bill was READ ONCE. | |
2009-05-26 | (H) Report was READ and ACCEPTED. | |
2009-05-26 | (H) Reported by Representative DUCHESNE for the Joint Standing Committee on Natural Resources pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 38, section 585-B, subsection 6. |