ME LD148 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-22 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-22 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Adjust Appropriations and Allocations from the General Fund and Other Funds for the Expenditures of the Department of Marine Resources, the Department of Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry, the Department of Environmental Protection and the Baxter State Park Authority for the Fiscal Year ending June 30, 2015
Title
An Act To Adjust Appropriations and Allocations from the General Fund and Other Funds for the Expenditures of the Department of Marine Resources, the Department of Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry, the Department of Environmental Protection and the Baxter State Park Authority for the Fiscal Year ending June 30, 2015
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-22 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | On motion by Senator Hamper of Oxford, REFERRED to the Committee on Appropriations and Financial Affairs, in concurrence. |
2015-01-29 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-01-29 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS. |
2015-01-29 | House | Committee on Appropriations and Financial Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=148&snum=127 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0106&item=1&snum=127 |