ME LD1470 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Regarding Reimbursement for Providing Inpatient Care to Individuals with Acute Mental Health Care Needs
Title
Resolve, Regarding Reimbursement for Providing Inpatient Care to Individuals with Acute Mental Health Care Needs
Sponsors
Rep. Michele Meyer [D] | Rep. Ryan Fecteau [D] | Rep. Patricia Hymanson [D] | Rep. Beth O'Connor [R] |
Rep. John Tuttle [D] | Rep. David Woodsome [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-02 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED in concurrence |
2021-07-02 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE, in concurrence. |
2021-06-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-09 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-447), in concurrence. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-447) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-08 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-08 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-447). |
2021-06-08 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2021-06-08 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2021-06-07 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2021-05-04 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2021-05-04 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-04-08 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-04-08 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on April 8, 2021. |