ME LD147 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-15 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-15 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Summary
An Act To Facilitate the Protection of Electric Utility Consumer Interests in Public Utility Commission Cases Involving the Construction, Rebuilding or Relocating of Transmission Lines
Title
An Act To Facilitate the Protection of Electric Utility Consumer Interests in Public Utility Commission Cases Involving the Construction, Rebuilding or Relocating of Transmission Lines
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Blanchard [D] | Sen. Lawrence Bliss [D] | Rep. Stacy Dostie [D] | Rep. Jon Hinck [D] |
Rep. Barry Hobbins [D] | Rep. David Van Wie [D] | Rep. Joseph Wagner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-15 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2009-04-14 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-04-14 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2009-04-08 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-23) in concurrence | |
2009-04-08 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2009-04-07 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2009-04-07 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-23) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2009-04-07 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2009-04-07 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence | |
2009-04-02 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-04-02 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-23) | |
2009-04-02 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2009-04-02 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2009-03-31 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2009-01-15 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator Hobbins of York, REFERRED to the Committee on UTILITIES AND ENERGY and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2009-01-15 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-01-15 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on UTILITIES AND ENERGY. | |
2009-01-15 | (H) Committee on Utilities and Energy suggested and ordered printed. |