ME LD1457 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Rename and Repurpose the Mountain View Youth Development Center as the Mountain View Correctional Facility and To Eliminate the Charleston Correctional Facility as a Facility Separate from Mountain View
Title
An Act To Rename and Repurpose the Mountain View Youth Development Center as the Mountain View Correctional Facility and To Eliminate the Charleston Correctional Facility as a Facility Separate from Mountain View
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2017-06-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-05 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-06-05 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2017-05-31 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-31 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-158). |
2017-05-31 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-05-31 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-158). |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-158) READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2017-04-18 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-18 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |