ME LD1457 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-08 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-08 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Authorizing the State Tax Assessor To Convey the Interest of the State in Certain Real Estate in the Unorganized Territory
Title
Resolve, Authorizing the State Tax Assessor To Convey the Interest of the State in Certain Real Estate in the Unorganized Territory
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-08 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2016-03-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-03 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2016-03-01 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-01 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-361). |
2016-03-01 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2016-03-01 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. |
2016-02-25 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-361). |
2016-02-23 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-361) READ and ADOPTED |
2016-02-18 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2015-12-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on November 23, 2015 and REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |