ME LD1457 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on June 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-08 - (S) 24 Yeas - 10 Nays- 1 Excused - 0 Absent
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on June 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-08 - (S) 24 Yeas - 10 Nays- 1 Excused - 0 Absent
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Strengthen the Consent Laws for Abortions Performed on Minors and Incapacitated Persons
Title
An Act To Strengthen the Consent Laws for Abortions Performed on Minors and Incapacitated Persons
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-08 | (S) 24 Yeas - 10 Nays- 1 Excused - 0 Absent | |
2011-06-08 | (S) Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 196 | |
2011-06-08 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules Reports READ On motion by Senator HASTINGS of Oxford Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED, in concurrence. | |
2011-06-07 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-06-07 | (H) Subsequently, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2011-06-07 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 139 (Yeas 63 - Nays 80 - Absent 7 - Excused 0) (Vacancy 1) | |
2011-06-07 | (H) Subsequently, the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report FAILED. | |
2011-06-07 | (H) Speaker laid before the House | |
2011-06-06 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-06-03 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-06-03 | (H) Later today assigned. | |
2011-06-03 | (H) On further motion of the same Representative TABLED pending her motion to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. | |
2011-06-03 | (H) Representative NASS of Acton moved to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. | |
2011-06-03 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator Hastings of Oxford, REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-04-12 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1457&snum=125 |
Text | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP1072&item=1&snum=125 |