ME LD1454 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 25 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-11 - On motion by Senator GOODALL of Sagadahoc, the Senate INSISTED to ACCEPTANCE of the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report..
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 25 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-11 - On motion by Senator GOODALL of Sagadahoc, the Senate INSISTED to ACCEPTANCE of the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report..
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
RESOLUTION, Proposing an Amendment to the Constitution of Maine To Establish a Unicameral Legislature
Title
RESOLUTION, Proposing an Amendment to the Constitution of Maine To Establish a Unicameral Legislature
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-10 - Senate - Accept Min Ontp Rpt RC #210 (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator GOODALL of Sagadahoc, the Senate INSISTED to ACCEPTANCE of the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report.. |
2013-06-11 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-11 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2013-06-11 | House | The RESOLUTION was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-234). |
2013-06-11 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the RESOLUTION was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2013-06-11 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-234) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2013-06-11 | House | The RESOLUTION was READ ONCE. |
2013-06-11 | House | On motion of Representative GRAHAM of North Yarmouth, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2013-06-11 | House | Reports READ. |
2013-06-10 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-06-10 | Senate | PREVAILED |
2013-06-10 | Senate | (25 -Yeas, 9 -Nays, 1 -Excused, 0 -Absent) |
2013-06-10 | Senate | Roll Call Number 210 |
2013-06-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator LACHOWICZ of Kennebec, the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED . (Remarks Made) (Roll Call Ordered) |
2013-06-10 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President. |
2013-06-07 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-06-06 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-06-06 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator, TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending her motion to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Senator LACHOWICZ of Kennebec moved to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-06-06 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator, TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending her motion to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Senator LACHOWICZ of Kennebec moved to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2013-04-25 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-04-25 | House | RESOLUTION REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | On motion by Senator Lachowicz of Kennebec REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT suggested and ordered printed |