ME LD145 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding the Membership of the Wild Blueberry Commission of Maine
Title
An Act Regarding the Membership of the Wild Blueberry Commission of Maine
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Alley [D] | Rep. Benjamin Collings [D] | Rep. Abigail Griffin [R] | Rep. Kathy Javner [R] |
Sen. David Miramant [D] | Sen. Marianne Moore [R] | Rep. William Tuell [R] | Rep. Stanley Zeigler [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-16 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-227), in concurrence. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-227) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-14 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-227). |
2019-05-14 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-05-14 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-01-17 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY in concurrence |
2019-01-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-17 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY. |
2019-01-17 | House | Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry suggested and ordered printed. |