ME LD1446 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on June 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-07 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Regarding the Confidentiality of Information in the Animal Welfare Laws

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Regarding the Confidentiality of Information in the Animal Welfare Laws

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-01 - House - Acc Min Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #206 (Y: 78 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-07SenatePlaced in Legislative Files (DEAD)
2017-06-07SenateOn motion by Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report AND PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-379) In NON-CONCURRENCE
2017-06-06HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-06HouseThe House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report.
2017-06-05SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2017-06-05SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-379) In NON-CONCURRENCE
2017-06-05SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-379) READ and ADOPTED
2017-06-05SenateREAD ONCE
2017-06-05SenateOn motion by Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. In NON-CONCURRENCE
2017-06-05SenateReports Read
2017-06-01HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-01HouseROLL CALL NO. 206 (Yeas 78 - Nays 61 - Absent 11 - Excused 1)
2017-06-01HouseOn motion of Representative DUNPHY of Old Town, the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
2017-06-01HouseReports READ.
2017-04-18SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY in concurrence
2017-04-13HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-04-13HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY.
2017-04-13HouseCommittee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback