ME LD1441 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-23 - (Placed in the Legislative Files. DEAD.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-23 - (Placed in the Legislative Files. DEAD.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Create Veteran-friendly Workplaces
Title
An Act To Create Veteran-friendly Workplaces
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-23 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #385 (Y: 77 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Accept Min Ontp Rpt RC #253 (Y: 7 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-06-01 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #213 (Y: 99 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Accept Min Ontp Rpt RC #253 (Y: 7 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-06-01 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #213 (Y: 99 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-23 | House | (Placed in the Legislative Files. DEAD.) |
2017-06-23 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 385V 77 having voted in the affirmative and 69 in the negative, with 5 being absent, and 0 excused, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become law and the veto was sustained. |
2017-06-23 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2017-06-23 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2017-06-22 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-22 | House | Later today assigned. |
2017-06-22 | House | On motion of Representative GOLDEN of Lewiston the Bill was TABLED pending RECONSIDERATION. |
2017-06-09 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-06-08 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-08 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-369) in concurrence |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-369) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-06-07 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 253 Yeas 7 - Nays 28 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin to ACCEPT The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report FAILED |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-05 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending his motion to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report, In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Senator MASON of Androscoggin moved to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Reports READ |
2017-06-01 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-01 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-369). |
2017-06-01 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-06-01 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-369) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-06-01 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2017-06-01 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 213 (Yeas 99 - Nays 41 - Absent 10 - Excused 1) |
2017-06-01 | House | On motion of Representative LUCHINI of Ellsworth, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-06-01 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-04-19 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-19 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to REFERENCE to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2017-04-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-04-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-13 | House | On motion of Representative LUCHINI of Ellsworth, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. |
2017-04-13 | House | Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed. |