ME LD1438 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Include Muzzle-loading Firearms, Bows and Crossbows as Dangerous Weapons for Purposes of Protection from Abuse Orders
Title
An Act To Include Muzzle-loading Firearms, Bows and Crossbows as Dangerous Weapons for Purposes of Protection from Abuse Orders
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-17 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2015-06-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-16 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED As Amended By Committee Amendment "A" (H-424) , in concurrence. |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-424) READ and ADOPTED , in concurrence. |
2015-06-16 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED , in concurrence. |
2015-06-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-15 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-424) |
2015-06-15 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2015-06-15 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2015-06-15 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2015-06-01 | Senate | On motion by Senator Burns of Washington, REFERRED to the Committee on Judiciary, in concurrence. |
2015-05-29 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-05-29 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2015-05-29 | House | Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed. |