ME LD1435 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Ensure Transparency in the Distribution of Federal Block Grant Funds
Title
An Act To Ensure Transparency in the Distribution of Federal Block Grant Funds
Sponsors
Rep. Erik Jorgensen [D] | Sen. Benjamin Chipman [D] | Sen. Roger Katz [R] | Rep. Andrew Gattine [D] |
Rep. Patricia Hymanson [D] | Rep. John Martin [D] | Sen. Teresa Pierce [D] | Rep. Karen Vachon [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #613 (Y: 86 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-04-02 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #549 (Y: 102 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #549 (Y: 102 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2018-04-18 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-18 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 613V 86 having voted in the affirmative and 61 in the negative, with 4 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained. |
2018-04-18 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2018-04-05 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2018-04-04 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-04 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-701) in concurrence |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-701) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence |
2018-04-03 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2018-04-03 | Senate | On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Reports Read |
2018-04-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-02 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-701). |
2018-04-02 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2018-04-02 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-701) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2018-04-02 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2018-04-02 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 549 (Yeas 102 - Nays 43 - Absent 6 - Excused 0) |
2018-04-02 | House | On motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2018-04-02 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-08-02 | House | Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2017-04-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-13 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2017-04-13 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |