ME LD1433 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Protect the Environment and Public Health by Further Reducing Toxic Chemicals in Packaging
Title
An Act To Protect the Environment and Public Health by Further Reducing Toxic Chemicals in Packaging
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-28 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #134 (Y: 96 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-03 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-362) in concurrence |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-362) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-05-30 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Subsequently On motion by Senator CARSON of Cumberland The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-05-29 | Senate | On motion by Senator CARSON of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Reports READ |
2019-05-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-28 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-362). |
2019-05-28 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-05-28 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-362) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-05-28 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-05-28 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 134 (Yeas 96 - Nays 44 - Absent 8 - Excused 2 Vacant 1) |
2019-05-28 | House | On motion of Representative TUCKER of Brunswick, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-05-28 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES in concurrence |
2019-03-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-28 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES. |
2019-03-28 | House | Committee on Environment and Natural Resources suggested and ordered printed. |