ME LD1433 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Protect Maine Children from Lung Cancer by Requiring Radon Testing in Schools

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Protect Maine Children from Lung Cancer by Requiring Radon Testing in Schools

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-02SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748.
2017-08-02SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 601.
2017-06-19SenateOn motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
2017-06-16HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-16HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2017-06-16SenateOrdered sent down forthwith.
2017-06-16SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-516), in concurrence.
2017-06-16SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-516) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
2017-06-16SenateREAD ONCE.
2017-06-16SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
2017-06-15HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-15HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-516).
2017-06-15HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2017-06-15HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2017-04-20HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-04-20HouseThe House RECEDED and CONCURRED to REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
2017-04-19SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2017-04-19SenateOn motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES In NON-CONCURRENCE
2017-04-19SenateTaken from the table by the President
2017-04-18SenateUnfinished Business
2017-04-18SenateOn motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE
2017-04-13HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-04-13HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
2017-04-13HouseCommittee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback