ME LD1432 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Implement the Recommendations of the Right To Know Advisory Committee Concerning Advance Payment of Costs for Public Records Requests
Title
An Act To Implement the Recommendations of the Right To Know Advisory Committee Concerning Advance Payment of Costs for Public Records Requests
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-06-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-05 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED in concurrence |
2017-05-31 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-05-31 | Senate | On motion by Senator KEIM of Oxford the Majority Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Reports Read |
2017-05-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-30 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2017-05-30 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-05-30 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2017-05-30 | House | On motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-05-30 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator Keim of Oxford REFERRED to the Committee on Judiciary and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218, in concurrence. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2017-04-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-13 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY |
2017-04-13 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2017-04-13 | House | Representative MOONEN for the Joint Standing Committee on Judiciary pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 1, section 411, subsection 6, paragraph G reports that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY and printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |