ME LD1431 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - The Bill was in the possession of the Joint Select Committee on Marijuana Legalization Implementation when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - The Bill was in the possession of the Joint Select Committee on Marijuana Legalization Implementation when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Dedicate a Portion of the Tax on the Sale of Marijuana to Substance Abuse Prevention and Treatment, Law Enforcement Costs and Regulatory Oversight
Title
An Act To Dedicate a Portion of the Tax on the Sale of Marijuana to Substance Abuse Prevention and Treatment, Law Enforcement Costs and Regulatory Oversight
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-13 | House | The Bill was in the possession of the Joint Select Committee on Marijuana Legalization Implementation when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2018-05-02 | House | Carried over to the next special session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748. |
2017-08-02 | House | Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on MARIJUANA LEGALIZATION IMPLEMENTATION in concurrence |
2017-04-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-13 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Joint Select Committee on MARIJUANA LEGALIZATION IMPLEMENTATION. |
2017-04-13 | House | Joint Select Committee on Marijuana Legalization Implementation suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1431&snum=128 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0985&item=1&snum=128 |