ME LD143 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Regarding Legislative Review of Portions of Chapter 4: Maine Motor Carrier Safety Regulation, a Major Substantive Rule of the Department of Public Safety, Bureau of State Police
Title
Resolve, Regarding Legislative Review of Portions of Chapter 4: Maine Motor Carrier Safety Regulation, a Major Substantive Rule of the Department of Public Safety, Bureau of State Police
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2015-04-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-04-23 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-42), in concurrence. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-42) READ and ADOPTED , in concurrence. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2015-04-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-04-09 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-42). |
2015-04-09 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2015-04-09 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. |
2015-04-07 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2015-01-29 | Senate | On motion by Senator Collins of York REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218, in concurrence. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2015-01-22 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-01-22 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |
2015-01-22 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2015-01-22 | House | Representative McLEAN for the Department of Public Safety pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 5, section 8072, reports that the Resolve be REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION and printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |