ME LD1429 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 601.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Regarding the Epidemic of Opiate Abuse

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Regarding the Epidemic of Opiate Abuse

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-02SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 601.
2017-06-19SenateOn motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
2017-06-16HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-16HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2017-06-15SenateOrdered sent down forthwith.
2017-06-15SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-510), in concurrence.
2017-06-15SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-510) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
2017-06-15SenateREAD ONCE.
2017-06-15SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
2017-06-15HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-15HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-510).
2017-06-15HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2017-06-15HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2017-05-11SenateREFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY in concurrence
2017-05-11SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence
2017-05-09HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-05-09HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY
2017-05-09HouseReport was READ and ACCEPTED.
2017-05-09HouseRepresentative HYMANSON from the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Reporting that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY.
2017-04-18SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence
2017-04-13HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-04-13HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
2017-04-13HouseCommittee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback