ME LD1421 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Permit a Student Holding a Degree from a Non-Maine Institution To Participate in the Job Creation Through Educational Opportunity Program
Title
An Act To Permit a Student Holding a Degree from a Non-Maine Institution To Participate in the Job Creation Through Educational Opportunity Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD). |
2014-02-13 | Senate | On motion by Senator HILL of York, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence. |
2014-02-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-02-11 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-596), in concurrence. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-596) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2014-02-04 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-02-04 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-596). |
2014-02-04 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2014-02-04 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2013-07-10 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145. |
2013-07-09 | House | Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | On motion by Senator Haskell of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on Taxation, in concurrence. |
2013-04-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-04-23 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. |
2013-04-23 | House | Committee on Taxation suggested and ordered printed. |