ME LD1419 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Regarding Legislative Review of Portions of Chapter 101: MaineCare Benefits Manual, Chapter III, Section 29, Allowances for Support Services for Adults with Intellectual Disabilities or Autism Spectrum Disorder, a Late-filed Major Substantive Rule of the Department of Health and Human Services
Title
Resolve, Regarding Legislative Review of Portions of Chapter 101: MaineCare Benefits Manual, Chapter III, Section 29, Allowances for Support Services for Adults with Intellectual Disabilities or Autism Spectrum Disorder, a Late-filed Major Substantive Rule of the Department of Health and Human Services
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2017-05-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-25 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2017-05-25 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED in concurrence |
2017-05-23 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2017-05-18 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-18 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2017-05-18 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-05-18 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-04-13 | Senate | On motion by Senator Brakey of Androscoggin REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218, in concurrence. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2017-04-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-11 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |
2017-04-11 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2017-04-11 | House | Representative HYMANSON for the Department of Health and Human Services pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 5, section 8072 and approved for introduction by a majority of the Legislative Council, reports that the Resolve be REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |