ME LD1417 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Require Insurance Coverage for the Diagnosis and Treatment of Lyme Disease

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Require Insurance Coverage for the Diagnosis and Treatment of Lyme Disease

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22SenatePursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
2017-08-02HouseCarried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138.
2017-08-02SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138.
2017-04-13SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES in concurrence
2017-04-11HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-04-11HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES.
2017-04-11HouseCommittee on Insurance and Financial Services suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback