ME LD1416 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
RESOLUTION, Proposing an Amendment to the Constitution of Maine to Increase the Percentage of the Population Required to Submit a State Referendum Question
Title
RESOLUTION, Proposing an Amendment to the Constitution of Maine to Increase the Percentage of the Population Required to Submit a State Referendum Question
Sponsors
Rep. Anne Graham [D] | Rep. William Bridgeo [D] | Sen. James Dill [D] | Rep. Holly Eaton [D] |
Rep. Holly Stover [D] | Rep. Maureen Terry [D] | Rep. Austin Theriault [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-06-01 | Senate | On motion by Senator HICKMAN of Kennebec the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Reports Read |
2023-05-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-05-30 | House | On motion of Representative SUPICA of Bangor, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2023-05-30 | House | Reports READ. |
2023-05-26 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2023-05-10 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-05-10 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2023-03-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-03-30 | House | The RESOLUTION was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2023-03-30 | House | Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |