ME LD1409 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-26 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-26 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Concerning the Labeling of Maine Shellfish Products
Title
An Act Concerning the Labeling of Maine Shellfish Products
Sponsors
Sen. Dana Dow [R] | Rep. Michael Mcclellan [R] | Rep. Jonathan Mckane [R] | Rep. James Parker [R] |
Sen. Christopher Rector [R] | Rep. Dianne Tilton [R] | Sen. David Trahan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-26 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence | |
2011-05-26 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-05-26 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2011-05-25 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-321) in concurrence | |
2011-05-25 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Rosen, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2011-05-24 | (S) ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. | |
2011-05-24 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence READ ONCE Committee Amendment "A" (H-321) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2011-05-24 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-05-24 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-321) | |
2011-05-24 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2011-05-24 | (H) Under suspension of the rules | |
2011-05-24 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2011-04-06 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator Snowe-Mello of Androscoggin, REFERRED to the Committee on MARINE RESOURCES and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2011-04-06 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-04-06 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on MARINE RESOURCES. | |
2011-04-06 | (H) Committee on Marine Resources suggested and ordered printed. |