ME LD140 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-25 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-25 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Amend the Laws Governing the Right to Counsel for Juveniles and Due Process for Juveniles
Title
An Act to Amend the Laws Governing the Right to Counsel for Juveniles and Due Process for Juveniles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-25 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-04-25 | Senate | On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Reports Read |
2023-04-20 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-04-20 | House | On motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2023-04-20 | House | Reports READ. |
2023-04-18 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-02-02 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-02-02 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-01-10 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY in concurrence |
2023-01-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-01-10 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2023-01-10 | House | Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=140&snum=131 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0086&item=1&snum=131 |