ME LD1397 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Placed in the Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Placed in the Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Establish the Affordable Heating from Maine's Forests Fund
Title
An Act To Establish the Affordable Heating from Maine's Forests Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-16 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #272 (Y: 91 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | Senate | Placed in the Legislative Files (DEAD). |
2015-06-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator WOODSOME of York the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2015-06-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-16 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 272 (Yeas 91 - Nays 58 - Absent 2 - Excused 0) |
2015-06-16 | House | On motion of Representative DION of Portland, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2015-06-16 | House | Reports READ. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin , REFERRED to the Committee on Energy, Utilities and Technology, in concurrence. |
2015-05-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-05-21 | House | Subsequently, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY. |
2015-05-21 | House | On motion of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan, the Bill was REMOVED from the Unassigned Table. |
2015-05-12 | House | On motion of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan, TABLED unassigned pending REFERENCE. |
2015-05-12 | House | Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY suggested and ordered printed. |