ME LD1396 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on August 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on August 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Remove Certain Restrictions Imposed on Retired State Employees Who Return to Work as Educators
Title
An Act To Remove Certain Restrictions Imposed on Retired State Employees Who Return to Work as Educators
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-08-02 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #449 (Y: 74 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Accept Rpt 'b' Otp-a Cab-523 RC #352 (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - Acc Report 'a' Otp As Amend RC #361 (Y: 82 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Accept Rpt 'b' Otp-a Cab-523 RC #352 (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - Acc Report 'a' Otp As Amend RC #361 (Y: 82 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-02 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2017-08-02 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-08-02 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 449V 74 having voted in the affirmative and 63 in the negative, with 13 being absent, and 1 excused, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained. |
2017-08-02 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2017-07-20 | Senate | Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2017-07-20 | Senate | On Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT in concurrence |
2017-06-22 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-22 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | On motion by Senator LANGLEY of Hancock The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With ACCEPTANCE of Report A Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-522) and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-522) in concurrence |
2017-06-21 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-21 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-522). |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "B" (H-523) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment "B" (H-523) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-06-21 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 352 Yeas 18 - Nays 15 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 |
2017-06-21 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin The Report B Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (H-523) Report ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Reports READ |
2017-06-20 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-20 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-522). |
2017-06-20 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-06-20 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-522) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-06-20 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2017-06-20 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 361 (Yeas 82 - Nays 63 - Absent 6 - Excused 0) |
2017-06-20 | House | On motion of Representative KORNFIELD of Bangor, REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended was ACCEPTED. |
2017-06-20 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator LANGLEY of Hancock The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With The Bill being REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS |
2017-04-18 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-18 | House | The House INSISTED on REFERENCE to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2017-04-13 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-04-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-11 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS |
2017-04-11 | House | Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed. |