ME LD1394 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on April 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-29 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on April 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-29 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Implement the Recommendations of the Commission To Strengthen the Adequacy and Equity of Certain Cost Components of the School Funding Formula
Title
An Act To Implement the Recommendations of the Commission To Strengthen the Adequacy and Equity of Certain Cost Components of the School Funding Formula
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2016-04-29 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #665 (Y: 95 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-29 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2016-04-29 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 665V 95 having voted in the affirmative and 52 in the negative, with 4 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained. |
2016-04-29 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2016-04-08 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2016-04-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-07 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-630) in concurrence |
2016-04-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator LANGLEY of Hancock Senate Amendment "A" (S-461) INDEFINITELY POSTPONED |
2016-04-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland Senate Amendment "A" (S-461) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-630) READ |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-630) READ |
2016-04-05 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2016-04-04 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-04 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-630) |
2016-04-04 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2016-04-04 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2016-04-04 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2015-07-21 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. , in concurrence. |
2015-06-30 | House | Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. in concurrence |
2015-05-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator Langley of Hancock REFERRED to Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS , in concurrence. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2015-05-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-05-07 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS |
2015-05-07 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2015-05-07 | House | Representative KORNFIELD for the Joint Standing Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs pursuant to Resolve 2013, chapter 114, section 10 reports that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS and printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |