ME LD1392 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-15 - (H) Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-15 - (H) Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Increase the Penalty for Sexual Abuse by Certain Offenders
Title
An Act To Increase the Penalty for Sexual Abuse by Certain Offenders
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-15 | (H) Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) | |
2011-06-15 | (H) ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-06-15 | (H) The House INSISTED to ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. | |
2011-06-14 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of minority OUGHT TO PASS AS AMENDED Report and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-283) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2011-06-14 | (H) ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-06-14 | (H) In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. | |
2011-06-14 | (H) On motion of Representative PLUMMER of Windham, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2011-06-14 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2011-06-10 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-283) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2011-06-10 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules | |
2011-06-10 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (S-283) READ and ADOPTED. | |
2011-06-10 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2011-06-10 | (S) Reports READ On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Minority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-283) Report ACCEPTED. | |
2011-04-05 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-04-05 | (H) Bill REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. | |
2011-04-05 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2011-04-05 | (S) On motion by Senator Mason of Androscoggin REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY | |
2011-04-05 | (S) suggested and ordered printed | |
2011-04-05 | (S) Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1392&snum=125 |
Text | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0432&item=1&snum=125 |