ME LD1389 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on February 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-13 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on February 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-13 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Disburse Funds to the Maine Fire Protection Services Commission
Title
An Act To Disburse Funds to the Maine Fire Protection Services Commission
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Theriault [R] | Rep. Scott Cyrway [R] | Rep. Robert Alley [D] | Sen. Peter Lyford [R] |
Rep. Roger Reed [R] | Rep. Paul Stearns [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2017-08-02 | House | Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY in concurrence |
2017-04-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-11 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2017-04-11 | House | Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1389&snum=128 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0963&item=1&snum=128 |