ME LD1385 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Governing Direct Primary Care Service Agreements

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Governing Direct Primary Care Service Agreements

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2017-05-30HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-05-30HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2017-05-24HouseIn concurrence.
2017-05-24HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-127).
2017-05-24HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2017-05-24HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2017-05-23SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
2017-05-23SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-127).
2017-05-23SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-127) READ and ADOPTED.
2017-05-23SenateREAD ONCE.
2017-05-23SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED.
2017-04-13HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-04-13HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES.
2017-04-11SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2017-04-11SenateOn motion by Senator WHITTEMORE of Somerset The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES
2017-04-11SenateCommittee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback