ME LD1383 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Amend Maine's Municipal Land Use and Eminent Domain Laws Regarding High-impact Electric Transmission Lines

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Maine's Municipal Land Use and Eminent Domain Laws Regarding High-impact Electric Transmission Lines

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-13 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #247 (Y: 79 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Accept Rpt 'a' Otp-a RC #249 (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - House - Acc Report 'a' Otp As Amend RC #196 (Y: 83 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13HousePlaced in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
2019-06-13HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-13HouseROLL CALL NO. 247V 79 having voted in the affirmative and 64 in the negative, with 7 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained.
2019-06-13HouseThis Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
2019-06-11SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-06-11HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-11HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-06-10SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-435) in concurrence
2019-06-10SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-435) READ and ADOPTED
2019-06-10SenateREAD ONCE
2019-06-10SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 249 Yeas 32 - Nays 3 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
2019-06-10SenateOn motion by Senator LAWRENCE of York Report A Ought to Pass As Amended ACCEPTED
2019-06-10SenateTaken from the table by the President
2019-06-07SenateUnfinished Business
2019-06-07SenateOn motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF ANY REPORT
2019-06-07SenateReports READ
2019-06-06HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-06HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-435).
2019-06-06HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2019-06-06HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-435) was READ and ADOPTED.
2019-06-06HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2019-06-06HouseROLL CALL NO. 196 (Yeas 83 - Nays 59 - Absent 6 - Excused 2 Vacant 1)
2019-06-06HouseSubsequently, REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended was ACCEPTED.
2019-06-06HouseSpeaker laid before the House
2019-06-05HouseUnfinished Business
2019-06-04HouseUnfinished Business
2019-06-04HouseLater today assigned.
2019-06-04HouseOn further motion of same Representative TABLED pending his motion to ACCEPT REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended .
2019-06-04HouseRepresentative BERRY of Bowdoinham moved to ACCEPT REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended .
2019-06-04HouseReports READ.
2019-03-26SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY in concurrence
2019-03-26HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-03-26HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY.
2019-03-26HouseCommittee on Energy, Utilities and Technology suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback