ME LD1383 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Failed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Failed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Improve the Delivery of Early Child Care and Education Services
Title
An Act To Improve the Delivery of Early Child Care and Education Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-07-09 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #441 (Y: 89 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-09 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2013-07-09 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 441V 89 having voted in the affirmative and 53 in the negative, with 9 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained. |
2013-07-09 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2013-06-27 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-27 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-27 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-27 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-27 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-464) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-362) thereto |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-464) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-362) thereto , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Committee Amendment "A" (H-464) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-362) thereto READ and ADOPTED , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-362) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-464) READ and ADOPTED |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules RECONSIDER ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (H-464) |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules RECONSIDER PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-464) |
2013-06-27 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by Senator HILL of York. |
2013-06-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator HILL of York, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE, pending ENACTMENT, in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2013-06-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-13 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-464), in concurrence. |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-464) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-12 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-12 | House | RELEASED. |
2013-06-12 | House | HELD at the Request of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham. |
2013-06-12 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-464) |
2013-06-12 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2013-06-12 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2013-06-12 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2013-04-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator Craven of Androscoggin, REFERRED to the Committee on Health and Human Services, in concurrence. |
2013-04-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-04-09 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2013-04-09 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |