ME LD1375 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Prohibit Certain Sexual Acts and Sexual Contact by Law Enforcement Officers in Performance of Official Duties and To Amend the Law on Obstructing Criminal Prosecution
Title
An Act To Prohibit Certain Sexual Acts and Sexual Contact by Law Enforcement Officers in Performance of Official Duties and To Amend the Law on Obstructing Criminal Prosecution
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-18 | Senate | Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2019-06-18 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-28 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-285), in concurrence. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-285) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-21 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-285). |
2019-05-21 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-05-21 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-03-21 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY in concurrence |
2019-03-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-21 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2019-03-21 | House | Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed. |