ME LD1372 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-22 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-22 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Amend the Workers' Compensation Self-insurance Laws to Allow for the Use of Fronting Companies
Title
An Act to Amend the Workers' Compensation Self-insurance Laws to Allow for the Use of Fronting Companies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-22 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2023-06-22 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-22 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-682), in concurrence. |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-682) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2023-06-22 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2023-06-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-21 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-682). |
2023-06-21 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2023-06-21 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2023-06-21 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2023-05-24 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2023-05-24 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-05-17 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | On motion by Senator Bailey of York, REFERRED to the Committee on Health Coverage, Insurance and Financial Services, in concurrence. |
2023-03-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-03-28 | House | On motion of Representative GERE of Kennebunkport, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES. |
2023-03-28 | House | Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING suggested and ordered printed. |