ME LD1371 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-09 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-09 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Encourage Greater Efficiency in the Unemployment Insurance System
Title
An Act To Encourage Greater Efficiency in the Unemployment Insurance System
Sponsors
Sen. Amy Volk [R] | Rep. Karleton Ward [R] | Sen. Andre Cushing [R] | Rep. Susan Austin [R] |
Rep. Lawrence Lockman [R] | Rep. Joel Stetkis [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-08 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #166 (Y: 76 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-06-05 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #152 (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-05 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #152 (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-09 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2015-06-09 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-09 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland The Senate Insisted To ACCEPTANCE of the Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-189) , in NON-CONCURRENCE. and ASKED for a COMMITTEE OF CONFERENCE |
2015-06-08 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-08 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2015-06-08 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 166 (Yeas 76 - Nays 64 - Absent 11 - Excused 0) |
2015-06-08 | House | On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2015-06-08 | House | Reports READ. |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-189) |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-189) READ and ADOPTED |
2015-06-05 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 152 19 Yeas - 15 Nays- 1 Excused - 0 Absent PREVAILED |
2015-06-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland Minority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-189) Report ACCEPTED |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Reports READ |
2015-04-28 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-04-28 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator Volk of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT |
2015-04-28 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT |