ME LD1365 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Include Additional Corrections Officers under the 1998 Special Plan for Retirement and To Amend the Laws Governing Retirement Benefits for Capitol Police Officers
Title
An Act To Include Additional Corrections Officers under the 1998 Special Plan for Retirement and To Amend the Laws Governing Retirement Benefits for Capitol Police Officers
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Bryant [D] | Sen. Troy Jackson [D] | Sen. Susan Deschambault [D] | Sen. William Diamond [D] |
Rep. Betty Austin [D] | Sen. Pinny Beebe-Center [D] | Rep. Patrick Corey [R] | Rep. Gary Hilliard [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #243 (Y: 80 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2017-06-08 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-07 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-07 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-410). |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-06-06 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Reports Read |
2017-06-06 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-06 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-410). |
2017-06-06 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-06-06 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-410) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-06-06 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2017-06-06 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 243 (Yeas 80 - Nays 63 - Absent 7 - Excused 1) |
2017-06-06 | House | On motion of Representative GATTINE of Westbrook, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-06-06 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2017-04-06 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-06 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS. |
2017-04-06 | House | Committee on Appropriations and Financial Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |