ME LD1364 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-07 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-07 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Regarding Legislative Review of Portions of Chapter 101: MaineCare Benefits Manual, Chapter III, Section 97: Private Non-Medical Institution Services, a Major Substantive Rule of the Department of Health and Human Services
Title
Resolve, Regarding Legislative Review of Portions of Chapter 101: MaineCare Benefits Manual, Chapter III, Section 97: Private Non-Medical Institution Services, a Major Substantive Rule of the Department of Health and Human Services
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-07 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2017-06-06 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-06 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2017-06-06 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2017-06-01 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-01 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-164). |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-05-31 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-164) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-05-31 | Senate | On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin Senate Amendment "A" (S-164) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Under furthur suspension of the Rules, On motion by Same Senator, the Senate RECONSIDERED whereby this Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was FINALLY PASSED |
2017-05-31 | Senate | RECALLED From Governor's Desk pursuant to Joint Order SP 574. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2017-05-18 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-18 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2017-05-18 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith |
2017-05-16 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2017-05-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-09 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2017-05-09 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-05-09 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-04-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator Brakey of Androscoggin REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218, in concurrence. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2017-04-06 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-06 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |
2017-04-06 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2017-04-06 | House | Representative HYMANSON for the Department of Health and Human Services pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 5, section 8072, reports that the Resolve be REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |