ME LD1364 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Failed on February 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-02 - (S) Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Failed on February 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-02 - (S) Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Improve the Quality and Reduce the Cost of Health Care
Title
An Act To Improve the Quality and Reduce the Cost of Health Care
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-02 | (S) Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) | |
2011-06-29 | (S) CARRIED OVER TO ANY SPECIAL OR REGULAR SESSION OF THE 125th LEGISLATURE PURSUANT TO JOINT ORDER HP 1190, IN CONCURRENCE | |
2011-06-29 | (H) Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 125th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1190. | |
2011-03-31 | (S) On motion by Senator McCormick of Kennebec, REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2011-03-30 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-03-30 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. | |
2011-03-30 | (H) Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1364&snum=125 |
Text | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP1003&item=1&snum=125 |