ME LD1352 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Provide for Consistency Regarding Persons Authorized To Conduct Examinations for Involuntary Hospitalization and Guardianship
Title
An Act To Provide for Consistency Regarding Persons Authorized To Conduct Examinations for Involuntary Hospitalization and Guardianship
Sponsors
Sen. Geoffrey Gratwick [D] | Sen. Russell Black [R] | Sen. Ned Claxton [D] | Sen. James Dill [D] |
Rep. Richard Farnsworth [D] | Rep. Victoria Morales [D] | Sen. Linda Sanborn [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-04 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-04 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-03 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-03 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2019-06-03 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-06-03 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2019-03-21 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-21 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Committee on JUDICIARY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on JUDICIARY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |