ME LD1349 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Increase Transparency in Dental Billing
Title
An Act To Increase Transparency in Dental Billing
Sponsors
Sen. Eloise Vitelli [D] | Sen. Stacy Brenner [D] | Sen. Marianne Moore [R] | Rep. Sean Paulhus [D] |
Rep. Holly Stover [D] | Rep. Denise Tepler [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-05-10 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2021-04-29 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2021-04-29 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on April 5, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1349&snum=130 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0431&item=1&snum=130 |